VA HB718 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0772)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0772)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles; trial as adults. Allows attorneys for the Commonwealth the discretion to have juveniles charged with repeat violations of certain drug offenses transferred to the circuit court for trial as an adult.
Title
Juveniles; transfer and trial as adults charged with certain offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (24-Y 14-N) (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 14-N) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (81-Y 17-N) (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 21-N) (Y: 81 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 3-N) (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 14-N) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (81-Y 17-N) (Y: 83 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 21-N) (Y: 81 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 3-N) (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0772) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 772 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB718ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (24-Y 14-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (82-Y 14-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (82-Y 14-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB718ER) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-05 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (81-Y 17-N) | |
2012-03-05 | House: Senate substitute with amendments agreed to by House 12105550D-S1 (81-Y 18-N) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (26-Y 14-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (26-Y 14-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments HB718S1 | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105550D-S1 | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (10-Y 4-N) | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105550D-S1 | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (9-Y 6-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 21-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House (79-Y 21-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2012-02-13 | House: Passed by temporarily | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-10 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-06 | House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety | |
2012-02-03 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-03 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 3-N) | |
2012-01-23 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) | |
2012-01-20 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102422D |