VA HB731 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0787)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0787)
Summary
Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority; board of directors; membership. Adds the Chancellor of the Virginia Community College System to the board of directors of the Authority to help better coordinate workforce development in Virginia. The bill contains a technical amendment. The bill, however, reduces by one the number of at-large citizen appointments made by the Governor effective with the next cycle of at-large citizen appointments.
Title
Economic Development Partnership Authority; adds Chancellor of Community College System to Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0787) | |
2008-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 787 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-26 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-24 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB731ER) | |
2008-03-24 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-07 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-07 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-07 | Senate: Reading of conference report waived | |
2008-03-07 | House: Conference substitute printed 082429456-H1 | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Senators: Herring, Petersen, Vogel | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2008-03-04 | House: Delegates: Caputo, Suit, Cosgrove | |
2008-03-04 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2008-03-04 | House: House acceded to request | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-27 | House: VOTE: --- REJECTED #2 (42-Y 51-N) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Senate amendments rejected by House (42-Y 51-N) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Reconsideration of Senate amendments agreed to by House | |
2008-02-27 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (62-Y 33-N) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (62-Y 33-N) | |
2008-02-26 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-08 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-07 | House: Printed as engrossed 086168812-E | |
2008-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB731E | |
2008-02-07 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-05 | House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned GL sub: Professional/Occupational/Adminstrative Process | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086168812 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB731 |