VA HB734 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Noxious weeds. Establishes an advisory committee to evaluate the risks of a plant or part thereof that is being considered for designation as a noxious weed. The bill requires the advisory committee to assess the plant's (i) impact on water bodies, other plants, livestock, land, public health, the environment, and the economy and (ii) current and potential in-state commercial viability. The bill exempts from the definition of noxious weed any plant whose in-state production is commercially viable.
Title
Noxious weeds; advisory committee to evaluate risks of a plant.
Sponsors
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171) | |
2016-03-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 171 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 3, 2016 | |
2016-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 02/25/16 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB734ER) |
2016-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-01-26 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-20 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102674D |