VA HB741 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0436)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0436)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Board for Asbestos, Lead, and Home Inspectors; licensing of home inspectors. Provides that beginning July 1, 2017, home inspectors must be licensed by the Virginia Board for Asbestos, Lead, and Home Inspectors (the Board). Currently, home inspectors must be certified. The bill requires the Board to promulgate regulations to implement the provisions of the bill effective no later than July 1, 2017, and exempts the Board's initial adoption of such regulations from the Administrative Process Act (§ 2.2-4000 et seq.), with the exception that the Board must provide an opportunity for public comment prior to adoption. The bill contains a technical amendment.
Title
Asbestos, Lead, and Home Inspectors, Virginia Board for; licensing of home inspectors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0436) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 436 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2016-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB741ER) |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB741H1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16104671D-H1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-12 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources and Technology |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 16104671D-H1 |
2016-02-02 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103780D |
Same As/Similar To
SB453 (Same As) 2016-03-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0161)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 500.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 516 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 517.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 517.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |