VA HB752 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0745)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0745)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Stalking; penalty. Provides that contacting or following or attempting to contact or follow the person at whom stalking conduct is directed after being given actual notice that the person does not want to be contacted or followed is prima facie evidence that the person intended to place the other person, or reasonably should have known that the other person was placed, in reasonable fear of death, criminal sexual assault, or bodily injury to himself or a family or household member. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission and is identical to
Title
Stalking; penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 95-N) (Y: 2 N: 98 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 95-N) (Y: 2 N: 98 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0745) | |
2016-04-20 | House | Enacted, Chapter 745 (effective 7/1/16) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2016-04-20 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2016-04-20 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB752ER2) |
2016-04-20 | House | Reenrolled |
2016-04-20 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2016-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-04-01 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2016-03-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/28/16 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB752ER) |
2016-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2016-03-11 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-11 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-10 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senators: Reeves, Deeds, Garrett |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2016-03-03 | House | Delegates: Bell, R.B., Gilbert, McClellan |
2016-03-03 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2016-03-02 | House | House acceded to request |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 95-N) |
2016-02-26 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 16105714D-S1 (2-Y 95-N) |
2016-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB752S1 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105714D-S1 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (12-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105714D-S1 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-05 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102756D |