VA HB754 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-14 - Senate: Failed to pass in Senate
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-14 - Senate: Failed to pass in Senate
Summary
Horse racing; local referendum; definition of town. Specifies that for the purposes of local referenda on pari-mutuel wagering on horse racing by a town with a population of 5,000 or more, population shall be calculated based upon the most recent population estimate by the United State Bureau of the Census or the most recent population update from the Weldon Cooper Center for Public Service at the University of Virginia.
Title
Horse racing; local referendum.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-14 | Senate: Failed to pass in Senate | |
2008-03-14 | Senate: No further action taken | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Chair ruled bill not properly before Senate | |
2008-03-05 | House: Speaker ruled Senate substitute not germane | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 15-N 1-A) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 14-N 1-A) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB754S2 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Substitute #2 by Senator Norment agreed to 089880284-S2 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Chair ruled substitute #2 germane | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 089880284-S2 (Norment) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Substitute #1 by Senator Norment rejected 082427284-S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee amendment rejected | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 082427284-S1 (Norment) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (9-Y 5-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-08 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-08 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (74-Y 25-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (74-Y 25-N) | |
2008-02-07 | House: Printed as engrossed 087032528-E | |
2008-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB754E | |
2008-02-07 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-05 | House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (17-Y 5-N) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087032528 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB754 |