VA HB787 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Acquisition of nutrient credits for construction activities. Allows persons applying for a stormwater permit to acquire nutrient credits for construction activities from credit providers located outside the tributary where the construction activity is occurring. Currently, the acquisition of such credits is generally limited to the same or adjacent eight-digit hydrologic code as defined by the U.S. Geological Survey.
Title
Construction activities; acquisition of nutrient credits.
Sponsors
Del. Les Adams [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100968D |