VA HB79 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0741)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0741)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Disability Commission; powers and duties; work groups; sunset. Provides that the Virginia Disability Commission shall establish work groups to assist the Commission in carrying out its powers and duties. Such work groups shall include work groups that focus on issues related to (i) housing and transportation, (ii) education and employment, (iii) publicly funded services, and (iv) such other issues as the Commission may deem necessary. The bill also repeals the sunset provision for the Commission, which is set to expire July 1, 2012.
Title
Disability Commission; establishing work groups to assist in carrying out powers and duties, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0741) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 741 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB79ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB79ER) | |
2012-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-01 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 12105663D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB79S1 | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105663D-S1 | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Incorporates HB1229 | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105663D-S1 | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-23 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-19 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-17 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-12-21 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-12-21 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100102D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1229 (Similar To) 2012-02-24 - Senate: Incorporated by Rules