VA HB791 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0696)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0696)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System. Makes technical changes to programs administered by the Virginia Retirement System.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; technical changes to programs administered.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Tata [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0696) | |
2012-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 696 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-29 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-29 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB791ER) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-27 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-27 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-25 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-23 | House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-16 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103185D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | 1 | 140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 142.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 161 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 218 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 512 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |