VA HB793 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Incorporated by Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Incorporated by Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Reduction of speed limits; local authority. Expands the current authority of any locality to reduce the speed limit to less than 25 miles per hour, but not less than 15 miles per hour, on highways within its boundaries that are located in a business district or residence district to include highways within the state highway system, provided that such reduced speed limit is indicated by lawfully placed signs.
Title
Speed limits; expands authority of any locality to reduce limit to less than 25 miles per hour.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Incorporated by Transportation |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1071-Carr) by voice vote |
2024-01-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Infrastructure and Funding |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103385D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1071 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 17, 2024
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+sum+HB793 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?241+ful+HB793+hil |