VA HB796 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0778)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0778)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Board of Health; guidelines for cleanup of residential property used as clandestine drug lab. Provides for the State Board of Health to establish guidelines for the cleanup of residential property formerly used as a clandestine methamphetamine laboratory.
Title
Health, State Board of; guidelines for cleanup of residential property used as clandestine drug lab.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0778) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 778 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB796ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 2-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (93-Y 2-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-02 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-02 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB796ER) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-20 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-19 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102139D |