VA HB80 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0742)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0742)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax; assessment of wetlands. Requires the local assessing official to separately assess the fair market value of wetlands on real property, if requested by the property owner.
Title
Real property tax; assessment of wetlands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0742) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 742 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB80ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 1-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 1-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-03 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-01 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-01 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB80ER) | |
2012-03-01 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-02 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-01 | House: Printed as engrossed 12100155D-E | |
2012-02-01 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB80E | |
2012-02-01 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-02-01 | House: Read second time | |
2012-01-31 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-30 | House: Reported from Finance with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-12 | House: Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 | |
2011-12-21 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-12-21 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100155D |