VA HB803 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Hillsboro in Loudoun County. Changes the election date for council members in even-numbered years to November, clarifies the voting authority of members who are appointed to fill unexpired terms, and updates a reference to Title 15.1 to Title 15.2.
Title
Charter; Town of Hillsboro in Loudoun County.
Sponsors
Del. Joe May [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 514 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-03 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-01 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-01 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB803ER) | |
2012-03-01 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-01 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-01 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-30 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-27 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #1 | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100550D |