VA HB809 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (11-Y 4-N)
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (11-Y 4-N)
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Local school boards; display of commercial advertising material on school buses. Permits local school boards to display commercial advertising material on the sides of school buses between the rear wheels and the rear of the bus, provided that no such material (i) obstructs the name of the school division or the number of the school bus, (ii) is sexually explicit, or (iii) pertains to alcohol; food or beverages that do not meet the nutrition standards developed by the U.S. Department of Agriculture pursuant to the federal Healthy, Hunger-Free Kids Act of 2010 or any additional state or local nutrition standards for food or beverages sold to students in school; gambling; politics; or tobacco.
Title
School boards, local; display of commercial advertising material on school buses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 24-N) (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 24-N) (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (11-Y 4-N) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed to LIS only 18107230D-S1 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-02 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (74-Y 24-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (74-Y 24-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 18100665D-E |
2018-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB809E |
2018-02-01 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Reported from Education with amendments (20-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100665D |