VA HB821 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Wrongful foreclosure; civil action. Creates a civil cause of action for the owner of any residential real property against any person who wrongfully asserts that he is, or has the authority to act as, the holder of the obligation secured by a deed of trust or mortgage on such property and who wrongfully initiates any foreclosure proceeding upon the property. The owner is entitled to recover actual damages incurred as a result of the wrongful foreclosure, in addition to reasonable attorney fees and costs.
Title
Wrongful foreclosure; creates civil cause of action for owner of any residential real property, etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101264D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB821 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB821+hil |