VA HB836 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Payment of wages and salaries; prepaid cards. Eliminates the ability of an employer to pay wages and salaries to an employee hired after January 1, 2010, by credit to a prepaid debit card or card account without the employee's consent if the employee does not designate an account at a financial institution to which payment may be sent by automated fund transfer. This measure allows payments of wages to be made by credit to a prepaid debit card or card account if the employee affirmatively consents and the employer discloses any applicable fees.
Title
Wages and salaries; payment by prepaid cards.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 5-N) (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-28 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 5-N) |
2014-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102593D |