VA HB862 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0569)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0569)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Punishment of a juvenile for possession, etc., of alcohol. Provides that a juvenile charged with possession, consumption, etc., of alcohol or public intoxication may be found delinquent of such a charge and punished, or have his case deferred and upon completion of the terms and conditions of his probation, have his case dismissed by the juvenile and domestic relations district court. Current law provides that the case shall be deferred and shall be dismissed upon completion of terms and conditions.
Title
Juveniles; punishment for possession, etc., of alcohol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0569) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 569 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB862ER) | |
2010-03-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-10 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-10 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 10105776D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB862S1 | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105776D-S1 | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105776D-S1 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-10 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB862H1 | |
2010-02-09 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104947D-H1 | |
2010-02-09 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104947D-H1 | |
2010-02-03 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102750D |