VA HB878 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
License taxes on certain motor vehicles. Allows localities to impose a license tax, not to exceed $250 annually, upon resident owners of motor vehicles that do not display license plates issued by the Commonwealth and that are not exempted from the requirements of displaying such license plates.
Title
Motor vehicles, certain; raises amount localities may charge for an annual license tax upon owners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 16-N) (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (64-Y 31-N) (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (72-Y 17-N) (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N) (Y: 2 N: 98 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N 1-A) (Y: 90 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (64-Y 31-N) (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (72-Y 17-N) (Y: 74 N: 17 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N) (Y: 2 N: 98 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N 1-A) (Y: 90 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Requires 27 affirmative votes for passage in enrolled form | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Passed in enrolled form rejected (21-Y 16-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (64-Y 31-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Governor's veto overridden (64-Y 31-N) | |
2012-04-09 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2012-03-17 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-15 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-15 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB878ER) | |
2012-03-15 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (36-Y 3-N) | |
2012-03-10 | House: Conference substitute printed 12106183D-H2 | |
2012-03-10 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (72-Y 17-N) | |
2012-03-10 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (72-Y 17-N) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Senators: Smith, Stanley, Ruff | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2012-03-08 | House: Delegates: Sickles, Iaquinto, Hodges | |
2012-03-08 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2012-03-08 | House: House acceded to request | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (37-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-08 | House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Senate amendments rejected by House (2-Y 96-N) | |
2012-03-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (28-Y 12-N) | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Amendments by Senator Barker agreed to | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 3-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N 1-A) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House (88-Y 11-N 1-A) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB878H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105247D-H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105247D-H1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (20-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 3-N) | |
2012-01-17 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #1 | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103887D |