VA HB883 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0613)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0613)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Comprehensive plan; telecommunications towers. Provides that a proposed telecommunications tower, and certain other facilities, shall be deemed to be substantially in accord with the comprehensive plan and planning commission approval shall not be required if the proposed telecommunications tower or facility is located in a zoning district that allows such telecommunications towers or facilities by right.
Title
Telecommunications towers; in accordance with comprehensive plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (71-Y 27-N) (Y: 73 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0613) | |
2016-04-01 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 613 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-16 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-16 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/16/16 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB883ER) |
2016-03-11 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-09 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (71-Y 27-N) |
2016-03-09 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (71-Y 27-N) |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Surovell agreed to |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (11-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB883H1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105384D-H1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-12 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105384D-H1 |
2016-02-12 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102883D |