VA HB885 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0587)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0587)
Summary
Bus idling; local ordinances. Allows all counties, cities, and towns to adopt ordinances limiting bus engine idling.
Title
Bus engine idling; allows all counties, cities, and towns power to adopt ordinances limiting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0587) | |
2008-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 587 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-04 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB885ER) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-29 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (50-Y 47-N) | |
2008-02-29 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (50-Y 47-N) | |
2008-02-28 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-28 | House: Reconsideration of Senate amendments agreed to by House | |
2008-02-28 | House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (45-Y 53-N) | |
2008-02-28 | House: Senate amendments rejected by House (45-Y 53-N) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (30-Y 10-N) | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (7-Y 6-N 2-A) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (53-Y 45-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House (53-Y 45-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB885H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 083551752-H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-07 | House: Committee substitute printed 083551752-H1 | |
2008-02-07 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 9-N) | |
2008-01-14 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: 3 | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083423752 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB885 |