VA HB907 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Continued to 2025 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-02 - Continued to 2025 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; voting equipment and systems; State Board approval process; printed receipt for cast ballot. Requires voting systems approved by the State Board of Elections to produce a printed receipt for each voter who has cast a ballot that shows the date and time the voter's ballot was cast, the voter's number corresponding to the order in which ballots were cast, and a list of all the voter's selections on the ballot as recorded by the voting system.
Title
Voting equipment and systems; State Board approval process, printed receipt for cast ballot.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-02 | House | Continued to 2025 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-01-28 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103360D |
Same As/Similar To
SB303 (Similar To) 2024-01-23 - Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N)