VA HB917 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0313)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0313)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Aging services; allocation of resources; individuals with the greatest economic need. Provides that in allocating resources for aging services, the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services (i) shall prioritize providing services to those with the greatest economic need and (ii) among individuals with comparable levels of economic need, may prioritize providing services to individuals with the greatest social need.
Title
Aging services; allocation of resources, individuals with the greatest economic need.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0313) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 313 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB917ER) |
2022-03-03 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101202D |