VA HB924 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0549)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0549)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electronic communications; admissibility of written reports or records. Allows the provider of an electronic communication service or remote computing service to verify the authenticity of written reports or records that it discloses by providing an affidavit from the custodian of the written records (or the person to whom the custodian reports) certifying that they are true and complete copies of the reports or records and were prepared in the regular course of business. When so authenticated no other evidence of authenticity is necessary, and the reports or records shall be considered business records for the purposes of the business records exception to the hearsay rule. The bill specifies that the contents of electronic communications shall not be considered part of such business records.
Title
Electronic communications; disclosure, verification and admissibility of contents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0549) | |
2016-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 549 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB924ER) |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-04 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-04 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 16105907D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB924S1 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105907D-S1 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105907D-S1 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Printed as engrossed 16101929D-E |
2016-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB924E |
2016-02-15 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101929D |