VA HB962 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Expungement of prostitution convictions. Allows a person to petition for expungement of convictions for prostitution when the person was induced to engage in prostitution through the use of force, intimidation, or deception by another.
Title
Prostitution; expungement of convictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103471D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 392.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |