VA HB975 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1034)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1034)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Instructional positions; students identified as having limited English proficiency. Requires, effective with the 2020-2021 school year, state funding to be provided pursuant to the general appropriation act to support 18.5 full-time equivalent instructional positions for each 1,000 students identified as having limited English proficiency and, effective with the 2021-2022 school year, 20 full-time equivalent instructional positions for each 1,000 students identified as having limited English proficiency. Current law requires state funding to support 17 such positions for each 1,000 such students.
Title
Standards of Quality; state funding, ratios of teachers to English language learners.
Sponsors
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 39-N) (Y: 52 N: 39 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 39-N) (Y: 52 N: 39 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 2-N) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1034) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1034 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB975ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (23-Y 16-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 39-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (52-Y 39-N) |
2020-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senators: Hashmi, Boysko, Vogel |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Delegates: Guzman, Kory, Robinson |
2020-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-05 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendments (34-Y 6-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 99-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (24-Y 16-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (9-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (58-Y 40-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 20105767D-EH1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB975EH1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee on Appropriations amendments agreed to |
2020-02-07 | House | Committee on Education substitute agreed to 20105767D-H1 |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendments (13-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 4-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Incorporates HB1323 (Kory) |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 20105767D-H1 |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104130D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1323 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Education
SB910 (Same As) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1035)
SB910 (Same As) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1035)