VA HB989 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0406)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0406)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections administration; duties of the Department of Elections; required election and voter participation information on the Internet. Requires the Department of Elections to provide information for voters on its website, including (i) the role of and contact information for the State Board of Elections, the Department of Elections, local electoral boards, and general registrars and (ii) information about absentee voting, polling hours, Virginia's voter identification requirements and acceptable forms of identification, the casting of ballots, and a means for voters to find their polling place. The bill requires such website to allow a voter to review his current voter registration information and voting history. The bill also requires that the Department provide a version of its website in which all parts are translated into any language that is spoken by a language minority group, including that any page linked to a translated page also be translated. Elections administration; duties of the Department of Elections; required election and voter participation information on the Internet. Requires the Department of Elections to provide information for voters on its website, including (i) the role of and contact information for the State Board of Elections, the Department of Elections, local electoral boards, and general registrars and (ii) information about absentee voting, polling hours, Virginia's voter identification requirements and acceptable forms of identification, the casting of ballots, and a means for voters to find their polling place. The bill requires such website to allow a voter to review his current voter registration information and voting history. The bill also requires that the Department provide a version of its website in which all parts are translated into any language that is spoken by a language minority group, including that any page linked to a translated page also be translated.
Title
Elections administration; duties of Dept. of Elections, required election and voter participation.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Tran [D] | Del. Irene Shin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 11-N) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 11-N) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0406) | |
2024-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 406 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB989ER) |
2024-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Passage (88-Y 11-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (88-Y 11-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 24100784D-E |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB989E |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-09 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Election Administration |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100784D |