VA HB996 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Expungement of certain misdemeanor drug offenses. Allows a person convicted of a misdemeanor offense of possession of a controlled substance or marijuana, or charged with such an offense which charge was deferred and dismissed, who has successfully completed all terms of probation to file a petition for expungement one year after the completion of such terms if he has not been convicted of any offense involving violence. Any conviction that is expunged will be considered a prior conviction for purposes of prosecution of any subsequent offense for which the prior conviction statutorily enhances punishment.
Title
Police and court records; expungement of certain misdemeanor drug offenses.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2016-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102851D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 392.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB996 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB996+hil |