VA HJR185 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-05 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ185ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-05 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ185ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of the Honorable Colon W. Whitehurst.
Title
Celebrating the life of the Honorable Colon H. Whitehurst.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ185ER) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Received |
2016-01-29 | House | Agreed to by House |
2016-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House |
2016-01-20 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 16103398D |