VA HJR35 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on January 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-21 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ35ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on January 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-21 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ35ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Adam Ward.
Title
Celebrating the life of Adam Ward.
Sponsors
Del. Gregory Habeeb [R] | Del. Terry Austin [R] | Sen. Chris Head [R] | Del. Les Adams [R] |
Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ35ER) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2016-01-18 | Senate | Received |
2016-01-15 | House | Agreed to by House |
2016-01-15 | House | Engrossed by House |
2015-12-15 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/13/16 16100292D |