VA HJR5012 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-10 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-10 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Confirming appointment of the Director of the Division of Legislative Services. Confirms the appointment by the House and Senate Committees on Rules of Amigo R. Wade as Director of the Division of Legislative Services.
Title
Legislative Services, Division of; confirming appointment of the Director.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-04 - House - House: VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | Senate | Left in Rules |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Reading waived |
2020-09-04 | House | VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-04 | House | Agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-04 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-09-04 | House | Taken up |
2020-09-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-08-27 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-08-25 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20200415D |