VA HJR545 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-21 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ545ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-21 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ545ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Hugh Dwyer Keogh.
Title
Commending Hugh Dwyer Keogh.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-21 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ545ER) | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2011-01-17 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2011-01-17 | Senate: Received | |
2011-01-14 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2011-01-14 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2011-01-13 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 11101442D | |
2010-12-17 | House: Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/12/11 11101442D |