VA HJR57 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ57ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ57ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
6888th Central Postal Directory Battalion Day. Designates September 16, in 2024 and in each succeeding year, as 6888th Central Postal Directory Battalion Day in Virginia.
Title
6888th Central Postal Directory Battalion Day; designating as Sept. 16, 2024 & each succeeding yr.
Sponsors
Del. Jackie Glass [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Candi Mundon King [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] |
Del. Briana Sewell [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ57ER) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reading waived |
2024-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House |
2024-02-06 | House | Taken up |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2024-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100732D |