VA HJR577 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); real property tax; assessed value. Provides that the General Assembly may authorize any locality to reduce the assessed value of real property, until the property is sold or the owner dies, whose fair market value has increased significantly as a result of public improvements abutting the property.
Title
Constitutional amendment; reducing assessed value of real property (first reference).
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Matt Fariss [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-10 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2017-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102079D |