VA HJR599 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-14)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ599ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending the Washington Capitals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending the Washington Capitals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ599ER)
2019-02-20SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateReading waived (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Rules by voice vote
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-01-22SenateReading waived
2019-01-21HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2019-01-21HouseEngrossed by House
2019-01-14HousePassed by for the day
2018-12-11HousePrefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/09/19 19101816D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback