VA HJR615 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ615ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ615ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of John Victor Moeser.
Title
Celebrating the life of John Victor Moeser.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] |
Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Del. Lee Ware [R] | Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ615ER) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Received |
2023-02-13 | House | Agreed to by House |
2023-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House |
2023-02-03 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 23100921D |