VA HJR623 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ623ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ623ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Pediatric Cancer Awareness Month. Designates September, in 2011 and in each succeeding year, as Pediatric Cancer Awareness Month in Virginia.
Title
Pediatric Cancer Awareness Month; designating September 2011, and each succeeding year thereafter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ623ER) | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Reported from Rules by voice vote | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Assigned Rules sub: #1 | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Reading waived | |
2011-01-21 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2011-01-21 | House: Taken up | |
2011-01-18 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103573D |