VA HJR691 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-27 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ691ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-27 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ691ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending St. Catherine's School.
Title
Commending St. Catherine's School.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-27 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ691ER) | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Received | |
2011-01-21 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2011-01-21 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2011-01-17 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 11103620D | |
2011-01-14 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 11103620D |