VA HJR810 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 30th anniversary of Ronald Reagan's "tear down this wall" speech.
Title
Commemorating the 30th anniversary of Ronald Reagan's 'Tear Down This Wall' speech.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Senate | Left in Rules |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reading waived |
2017-01-27 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2017-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House |
2017-01-20 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 17104219D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HJ810 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HJ810+hil |