VA HJR83 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JLARC; Compensation Board funding for the offices of constitutional officers; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study Compensation Board funding for the offices of constitutional officers and to review the trends and trajectory of general fund support in the state budget for the offices of constitutional officers, the metrics by which support is determined, the equity of such state support considering the needs of the various localities, and the degree by which localities are supplementing the Commonwealth's funding.
Title
Constitutional officers, offices of; JLARC to study Compensation Board funding.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Rules |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104353D |