VA HJR900 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ900ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-27 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ900ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Robert T. Williamson.
Title
Commending Robert T. Williamson.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ900ER) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Received |
2015-02-24 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2015-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House |
2015-02-20 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 15105230D |