VA HR13 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Passed on January 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-15 - Bill text as passed House (HR13ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Passed on January 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-15 - Bill text as passed House (HR13ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Sandra Gioia Treadway.
Title
Commending Sandra Gioia Treadway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-15 | House | Bill text as passed House (HR13ER) |
2024-01-15 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2024-01-15 | House | Engrossed by House |
2024-01-11 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 24100288D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR69 (Similar To) 2024-01-25 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ69ER)
SJR67 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ67ER)
SJR67 (Similar To) 2024-02-05 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ67ER)