VA SB1005 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0647)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0647)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Corporal Ryan C. McGhee Memorial Bridge. Designates the bridge on Guinea Station Road over Interstate 95 in Spotsylvania County the CPL Ryan C. McGhee Memorial Bridge.
Title
CPL Ryan C. McGhee Memorial Bridge; bridge over I-95.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0647) | |
2020-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 647 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1005ER) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (96-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Passed House with amendment (96-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-02-21 | House | Amendment by Delegate McQuinn agreed to |
2020-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20104496D-E |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1005E |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 20104496D |