VA SB1007 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permit fees for solid waste facilities. Establishes the same fee structure for sanitary landfills, noncaptive industrial landfills, and construction and demolition debris landfills. All of these types of facilities will be required to pay an annual fee of $0.115 per ton of waste deposited in their facility. Currently, noncaptive industrial landfills pay an annual fee of $8,000 and construction and demolition debris landfills pay $4,000 annually, while the fee schedule for sanitary landfills is based on the annual tonnage of waste deposited in the landfill. Incinerators and energy recovery facilities will be assessed an annual fee of $0.055 per ton. The fees will be adjusted annually based on the Consumer Price Index. The annual fee has been increased for other types of facilities such as composting, regulated medical waste, transfer stations, etc. The bill also requires the Department of Environmental Quality to continue its efforts to improve its solid waste program and submit a report to the General Assembly regarding such efforts by December 1, 2011.
Title
Permit fees for solid waste facilities; establishes same fee structure for sanitary landfills, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 39-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 39-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420) | |
2011-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 420 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-21 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1007ER) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 39-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Passed House with amendments (57-Y 39-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2011-02-16 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-02-16 | House: VOTE: AGREE TO (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Constitutional reading dispensed (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-15 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (18-Y 4-N) | |
2011-02-14 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-14 | House: Referred from Appropriations by voice vote | |
2011-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-11 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (18-Y 4-N) | |
2011-02-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2011-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11103438D-E | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1007E | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (10-Y 5-N) | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103438D |