VA SB1008 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0809)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0809)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal history records checks; barrier crimes. Clarifies the individual crimes that constitute a barrier for (i) individuals seeking employment at nursing homes, home care organizations, hospices, state facilities, and private providers licensed by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, community services boards, behavioral health authorities, assisted living facilities, adult day care centers, children's welfare agencies, family day homes approved by family day systems, and children's residential facilities; (ii) applicants for licensure, registration, or approval as assisted living facilities, child welfare agencies, or family day homes approved by family day systems; (iii) individuals with whom a local board of social services or child-placing agency is considering placing a child on an emergency, temporary, or permanent basis; (iv) foster and adoptive homes seeking approval from child-placing agencies; and (v) providers of adult services and adult foster care seeking approval by the Department of Social Services. The bill also adds certain offenses to the list of barrier crimes.
Title
Barrier crimes; clarifies individual crimes, criminal history records checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0809) | |
2017-04-05 | House | Enacted, Chapter 809 (effective 7/1/17) |
2017-04-05 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB1008ER2) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2017-04-05 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2017-04-05 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1008ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Title replaced 17105531D-H1 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1008H1 |
2017-02-22 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 17105531D-H1 |
2017-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 17105531D-H1 |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1008S1 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104608D-S1 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104608D-S1 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100081D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 914 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 333.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 389 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 296.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 126.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 162.9:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 314 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 408.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 416 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 2 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1601.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1717 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1719 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1720 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1720.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1721 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1721.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1722 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1726 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 901.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |