VA SB1013 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plates; Purple Heart recipients; fees. Eliminates the fee for issuance or renewal of Purple Heart license plates, provided that only one set of plates can be issued free for any one applicant.
Title
License plates, special; eliminates fee for issuance or renewal of Purple Heart license plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436) | |
2011-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 436 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-25 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-25 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1013ER) | |
2011-02-25 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-21 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-18 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-17 | House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-10 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #3 | |
2011-02-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11101704D-E | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1013E | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (13-Y 0-N 2-A) | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101704D |