VA SB1024 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0720)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0720)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health care practitioners; reporting disabilities of drivers. Provides that any doctor of medicine, osteopathy, chiropractic, or podiatry or any nurse practitioner, physician assistant, optometrist, physical therapist, or clinical psychologist who reports to the Department of Motor Vehicles the existence, or probable existence, of a mental or physical disability or infirmity of any person licensed to operate a motor vehicle that the reporting individual believes affects such person's ability to operate a motor vehicle safely is not subject to civil liability or deemed to have violated the practitioner-patient privilege unless he has acted in bad faith or with malicious intent. This bill is identical to HB 1514.
Title
Doctor of medicine, etc.; reporting disabilities of drivers to DMV, not subject to civil liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (32-Y 8-N) (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0720) | |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 720 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1024ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-23 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (32-Y 8-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2017-02-22 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred from Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1024S1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17104028D-S1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17104028D-S1 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101500D |