VA SB1028 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Drug Treatment Courts. Provides for the establishment of drug treatment courts in Buchanan, Dickenson, Goochland, Montgomery, and Russell Counties, and for the establishment of a drug treatment court in the County of Wise that will serve the Counties of Lee, Scott, and Wise; and that funding shall be from federal appropriations or other nongeneral funds as may be made available for the purpose.
Title
Drug treatment courts; established in various counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-15 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11103527D-E | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1028E | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103527D |
Subjects
Buchanan County
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Dickenson County
Goochland County
Montgomery County
Narcotics and Drugs
Russell County
Wise County
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Dickenson County
Goochland County
Montgomery County
Narcotics and Drugs
Russell County
Wise County