VA SB1042 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Capital outlay plan. Revises the six-year capital outlay plan for projects to be funded entirely or partially from general fund-supported resources.
Title
Capital outlay plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 36-N) (Y: 2 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 36-N) (Y: 2 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 500 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1042ER) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 15105554D-S1 |
2015-02-23 | House | Delegates: Jones, Cox, Joannou |
2015-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senators: Colgan, Stosch, Ruff |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | House requested conference committee |
2015-02-18 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2015-02-17 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (2-Y 36-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1042H1 |
2015-02-13 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105006D-H1 |
2015-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-11 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105006D-H1 |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101220D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1891 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0499)