VA SB1050 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0621)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Forgery; venue. Provides that, in addition to the current forgery venue provisions, forgery may be prosecuted in any county or city where an issuer, acquirer, or account holder sustained a financial loss as a result of the offense. This bill is identical to HB 1751.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forgery; venue for prosecution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0621)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 621 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1050ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-15HouseReported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
2018-12-02SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-12-02SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100988D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192245.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1050
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1050+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1050ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0621+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0187+SB1050
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0313SB1050+SB1050
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0347SB1050+SB1050
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0348SB1050+SB1050
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0138+SB1050
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0344+SB1050
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3095+SB1050

Bill Comments

feedback