VA SB1055 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Child welfare agencies; background checks and barrier crimes. Establishes a national fingerprint-based criminal history record check requirement for licensure or registration as a child welfare agency; for approval as a family day home by a family day system; for approval as a foster or adoptive parent; for employment or to volunteer at a child welfare agency or family day home; and for all adults residing in a home in which a family day home is operated. The bill also adds the offenses that require registration in the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry to those in current law for which it is unlawful for any person to operate a family day home if he, or if he knows that any other person who resides in, is employed by, or volunteers in the home, has been convicted of such offense. The bill requires that a search of the statewide central registry maintained pursuant to § 63.2-1515 for information on any investigation of child abuse or neglect undertaken against employees and volunteers of child day centers and family day homes be conducted annually, and that initial background checks for such employees and volunteers include, among other existing requirements, a sworn statement or affirmation disclosing whether the person is currently the subject of a complaint of child abuse or neglect. The provisions of the bill related to national fingerprint-based criminal history record checks have a delayed effective date of July 1, 2017. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Child welfare agencies; background checks, barrier crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1055S2 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104707D-S2 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 15104487D-S1 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104707D-S2 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Incorporates SB911 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104487D-S1 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Assigned Rehab sub: Childcare |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100025D |
Same As/Similar To
SB911 (Similar To) 2015-01-30 - Incorporated by Rehabilitation and Social Services